NY S07746 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.438
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.438
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-13Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.125
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted for a10634
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to insurance
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7746A
2018-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.731
2018-02-15SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10634 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7746a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback