NY S07771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an emergency insulin program and corresponding emergency insulin program trust fund to facilitate emergency access to analog insulins.
Title
Establishes an emergency insulin program and corresponding emergency insulin program trust fund to facilitate emergency access to analog insulins.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.561 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10054 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - referred to health