NY S07775 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants the village of Farmingdale retroactive real property tax exempt status for lots located at 254 Main Street, village of Farmingdale, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants the village of Farmingdale retroactive real property tax exempt status for lots located at 254 Main Street, village of Farmingdale, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.439
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.327
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a9574c
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1584
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-22SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09574 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7775

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback