NY S07778 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.361 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.984 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7778 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.97 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9816 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.984 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09816 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.361