NY S07787 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state ALS research and education fund; qualifies that the commissioner of health shall expend moneys from such fund to the ALS associations.
Title
Relates to the New York state ALS research and education fund; qualifies that the commissioner of health shall expend moneys from such fund to the ALS associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.327 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.828 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7787 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.195 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9913 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.828 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09913 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - signed chap.327