NY S07797 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to participants in the World Trade Center rescue.
Title
Relates to participants in the World Trade Center rescue.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.266 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a10499 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.661 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7797A |
2018-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10366 (Same As) 2018-04-27 - enacting clause stricken
A10499 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7797a
A10499 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7797a