NY S07812 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7812B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7812B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the provision of health care services under medicaid managed care programs by school-based health centers.
Title
Provides for the provision of health care services under medicaid managed care programs by school-based health centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7812B |
2020-10-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7812A |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09894 (Same As) 2020-11-06 - print number 9894b