NY S07821 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to electronic payment of fees of brand label registration and to changing the time required for an application to be deemed approved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to electronic payment of fees of brand label registration and to changing the time required for an application to be deemed approved.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.440
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-13Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading cal.731
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted for a9996b
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to economic development
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7821A
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.616
2018-02-28SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09996 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7821a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback