NY S07828 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for pharmacy benefit management and the procurement of prescription drugs to be dispensed to patients, or the administration or management of prescription drug benefits; sets forth definitions; provides for funds received by a pharmacy in trust for the health plan or provider and provides for accountability of such funds; further provides for an appeals process to investigate and resolve disputes regarding multi-source generic drug pricing.
Title
Provides for pharmacy benefit management and the procurement of prescription drugs to be dispensed to patients, or the administration or management of prescription drug benefits; sets forth definitions; provides for funds received by a pharmacy in trust for the health plan or provider and provides for accountability of such funds; further provides for an appeals process to investigate and resolve disputes regarding multi-source generic drug pricing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.607 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09902 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - reported referred to codes