NY S07853 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the construction of public water mains and connections to provide a pure and wholesome source of drinking water to inhabitants whose drinking water supply has been contaminated by toxic or hazardous substances within the definition of water quality improvement project.
Title
Includes the construction of public water mains and connections to provide a pure and wholesome source of drinking water to inhabitants whose drinking water supply has been contaminated by toxic or hazardous substances within the definition of water quality improvement project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.490 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.339 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9979a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7853A |
2018-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09979 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7853a