NY S07861 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to elections and elective officers of new towns.
Title
Relates to elections and elective officers of new towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.104 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9969a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1193 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7861A |
2018-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09969 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7861a