NY S07879 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an agricultural assessment online database providing for single county, regional or state-wide searches for primary agricultural property classifications.
Title
Establishes an agricultural assessment online database providing for single county, regional or state-wide searches for primary agricultural property classifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10413 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - referred to agriculture