NY S07881 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an association representing motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers, to create and implement a comprehensive educational program designed to advance for-hire motor vehicle safety and provide such training; allows for a reduction in rates of certain commercial risk insurance premiums for motor vehicles upon completion of such course; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes an association representing motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers, to create and implement a comprehensive educational program designed to advance for-hire motor vehicle safety and provide such training; allows for a reduction in rates of certain commercial risk insurance premiums for motor vehicles upon completion of such course; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.51 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.347 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.832 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7881 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-05 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.471 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-24 | Senate | print number 9763a |
2020-02-24 | Senate | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-02-10 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9763A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.832 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09763 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51