NY S07906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of certain powers of the state liquor authority for an additional 3 years.
Title
Extends the expiration of certain powers of the state liquor authority for an additional 3 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.117 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1048 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a10470 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1203 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10470 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - substituted by s7906