NY S07912 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.321
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.321
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.56
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a9993a
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1245
2018-04-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 7912A
2018-04-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2018-03-09SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09993 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7912a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback