NY S07926 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting a party to an order of protection from remotely controlling any connected devices affecting the home, vehicle or property of the person protected by such order.
Title
Relates to prohibiting a party to an order of protection from remotely controlling any connected devices affecting the home, vehicle or property of the person protected by such order.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.261 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.834 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7926 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.259 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.259 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-03-04 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10039 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.834 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10039 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.261