NY S07952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear; extends effectiveness.
Title
Relates to the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage deer and bear; extends effectiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.383 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1090 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10863 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.990 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10863 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - substituted by s7952