NY S07966 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends the effectiveness for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.346 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1032 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10059 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1629 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10059 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7966