NY S07986 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to continuing education for professional engineers, land surveyors and professional geologists; relates to mandatory continuing education for land surveyors.
Title
Relates to continuing education for professional engineers, land surveyors and professional geologists; relates to mandatory continuing education for land surveyors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.260 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.837 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7986A |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.197 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.197 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-03-13 | Senate | print number 10021a |
2020-03-13 | Senate | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-03-04 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10021A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.837 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7986A |
2020-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10021 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.260