NY S07995 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state-wide literacy education advocacy program modelled after the Newburgh Armory Unity Center Literacy Education Advocacy Partnership; and to study the viability of the Newburgh Armory Unity Center Literacy Education Advocacy Partnership.
Title
Creates a state-wide literacy education advocacy program modelled after the Newburgh Armory Unity Center Literacy Education Advocacy Partnership; and to study the viability of the Newburgh Armory Unity Center Literacy Education Advocacy Partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.838 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7995A |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10105 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - print number 10105a