NY S07996 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that school districts, including the city school district of the city of New York, are entited to an apportionment of state aid for the closure of schools due in response to the novel coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that school districts, including the city school district of the city of New York, are entited to an apportionment of state aid for the closure of schools due in response to the novel coronavirus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.107
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-27Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.27
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted for a10189a
2020-05-27Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.640
2020-05-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 7996B
2020-05-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2020-03-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 7996A
2020-03-13SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2020-03-06SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10189 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - substituted by s7996b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07996&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07996&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07996
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07996&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07996A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07996&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07996B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S7996#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S7996#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07996&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S7996#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback