NY S08000 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning and report the findings of such study and any recommendations to the governor and legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning and report the findings of such study and any recommendations to the governor and legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.18
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.460
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.471
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10063b
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1867
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 8000B
2018-06-11SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-03-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 8000A
2018-03-26SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10063 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8000b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08000&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08000&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08000
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08000&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08000A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08000&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08000B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8000#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8000#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08000&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback