NY S08014 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4501A

Summary

Requires a label warning of the hazard of early childhood tooth decay upon the sale of baby-bottles and sippy cups by any manufacturer or importer of such products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a label warning of the hazard of early childhood tooth decay upon the sale of baby-bottles and sippy cups by any manufacturer or importer of such products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-23 SUBSTITUTED BY A4501A
2010-06-10 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-06-09 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-06-08 1ST REPORT CAL.812
2010-05-28 REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A04501 (Same As) 2010-07-31 - tabled

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback