NY S08021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Family Service League to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Family Service League to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.199
2018-08-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.1038
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10143a
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED 8021A
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1377
2018-05-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10143 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8021a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08021&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08021&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08021
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08021&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08021A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8021#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8021#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8021#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08021&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback