NY S08029 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10176A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10176A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the MTA to study and report on the feasibility of rehabilitating the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge and requires the chairman of the MTA to submit a written report with the findings and recommendations of the study.
Title
Directs the MTA to study and report on the feasibility of rehabilitating the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge and requires the chairman of the MTA to submit a written report with the findings and recommendations of the study.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10176A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1594 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8029A |
2018-04-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10176 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled