NY S08049 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends until January 1, 2021, the deadline to apply for the solar electric generating system real property tax abatement.
Title
Extends until January 1, 2021, the deadline to apply for the solar electric generating system real property tax abatement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10150 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.979 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10150 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - signed chap.327