NY S08052 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8052C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8052C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mitigating the closure of the L subway line in the city of New York; directs the MTA in consultation with other relevant entities to develop a plan to mitigate the individual and economic hardships due to the L subway line closure; establishes a temporary high-occupancy vehicle program on the Williamsburg bridge by means of mobile or stationary photo devices.
Title
Relates to mitigating the closure of the L subway line in the city of New York; directs the MTA in consultation with other relevant entities to develop a plan to mitigate the individual and economic hardships due to the L subway line closure; establishes a temporary high-occupancy vehicle program on the Williamsburg bridge by means of mobile or stationary photo devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8052C |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8052B |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8052A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09861 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES