NY S08066 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing the state university of New York and city university of New York endowment fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing the state university of New York and city university of New York endowment fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2016-06-16SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1883
2016-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10297 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback