NY S08066 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.366
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-13Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.121
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted for a10415
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.900
2018-03-23SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10415 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8066

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback