NY S08070 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants retroactive membership in the teachers' retirement system to Margaret Russo based upon prior employment with the Brooklyn public library.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants retroactive membership in the teachers' retirement system to Margaret Russo based upon prior employment with the Brooklyn public library.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.322
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.486
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10388
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.748
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10388 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8070

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback