NY S08074 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authority of the New York State Association for Retarded Children, Inc. to maintain bonds until 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authority of the New York State Association for Retarded Children, Inc. to maintain bonds until 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.444
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.59
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a10332
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1015
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10332 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s8074

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback