NY S08092 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Wayne county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Wayne.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Wayne county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Wayne.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.385 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10248 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1145 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10248 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8092