NY S08100 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to authorizing sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" from August 1, 2018 to August 1, 2021.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to authorizing sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" from August 1, 2018 to August 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.386 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1083 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10856 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.993 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10856 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8100