NY S08103 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.235 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.471 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10641a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1806 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10641 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8103