NY S08114 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state reimbursement to counties and cities in which a county is located of the full amount of expenditures for indigent legal services.
Title
Requires state reimbursement to counties and cities in which a county is located of the full amount of expenditures for indigent legal services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.306 |
2016-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.535 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10706 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1889 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10706 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8114