NY S08118 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to changes in health insurance contracts or plans for retired officers, employees, and their families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to changes in health insurance contracts or plans for retired officers, employees, and their families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.367
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.352
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10337
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1871
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-29SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10337 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8118

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback