NY S08119 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - VETOED MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to paratransit services within the state and city of New York during the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to paratransit services within the state and city of New York during the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.54
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-27Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.33
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted for a10303b
2020-05-27Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.642
2020-05-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2020-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 8119C
2020-05-24SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2020-05-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 8119B
2020-05-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2020-04-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 8119A
2020-04-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2020-03-23SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A10303 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8119c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8119
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08119&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08119
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08119&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08119A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08119&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08119B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08119&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08119C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8119#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8119#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S8119#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08119&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback