NY S08122 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the filing of applications and renewal applications for real property tax abatement programs to July 15, 2020.
Title
Extends the deadline for the filing of applications and renewal applications for real property tax abatement programs to July 15, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.92 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.28 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted for a10241a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.643 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8122B |
2020-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8122A |
2020-03-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10241 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92