NY S08141 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the MTA to hold public hearings prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides that the MTA hold a public hearing on any proposed closings due to construction, improvement, reconstruction or rehabilitation where such facility will be out-of-service for ninety days or longer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the MTA to hold public hearings prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides that the MTA hold a public hearing on any proposed closings due to construction, improvement, reconstruction or rehabilitation where such facility will be out-of-service for ninety days or longer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.23
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.521
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.249
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10179
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1773
2018-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 8141A
2018-05-14SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-04-06SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A10179 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8141a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback