NY S08154 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New York state decommissioning oversight boards for nuclear power plants; defines terms; provides that a New York state decommissioning oversight board shall be established for a state retiring facility within one month after such facility's future closure is noticed to the nuclear regulatory commission; establishes an eleven member board; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes New York state decommissioning oversight boards for nuclear power plants; defines terms; provides that a New York state decommissioning oversight board shall be established for a state retiring facility within one month after such facility's future closure is noticed to the nuclear regulatory commission; establishes an eleven member board; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.849 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8154B |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-07-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8154A |
2020-07-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10236 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.293