NY S08178 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.369
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.358
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10454
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1461
2018-04-16SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10454 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8178

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback