NY S08187 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state university of New York to enter into a lease and otherwise contract to make grounds available and facilities of the state university of New York at Stony Brook to the Ronald McDonald House of Long Island, Inc., a not-for-profit corporation, to ensure quality pediatric health care services to the surrounding community; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state university of New York to enter into a lease and otherwise contract to make grounds available and facilities of the state university of New York at Stony Brook to the Ronald McDonald House of Long Island, Inc., a not-for-profit corporation, to ensure quality pediatric health care services to the surrounding community; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.498
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.390
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11037
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8187A
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1425
2018-04-16SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A11037 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8187a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback