NY S08212 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any legislation included in with the governor's article VII submission must be directly necessary to provide moneys and revenues sufficient to meet such proposed expenditures.
Title
Provides that any legislation included in with the governor's article VII submission must be directly necessary to provide moneys and revenues sufficient to meet such proposed expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-06-05 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8212A |
2020-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |