NY S08217 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to physical therapy assistants.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to physical therapy assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.107 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.852 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a10381a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10381 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8217