NY S08235 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes funds to municipalities from the UDC in the case of certain tax certiorari challenges or agreed upon settlements resulting in loss of tax revenues or increased tax levies of over twenty percent or in regards to a settlement agreement, a reduction in real property taxes or a payment in lieu of taxes of at least twenty percent in the aggregate over the term of such settlement agreement; and permits the establishment of tax certiorari stabilization reserve funds.
Title
Authorizes funds to municipalities from the UDC in the case of certain tax certiorari challenges or agreed upon settlements resulting in loss of tax revenues or increased tax levies of over twenty percent or in regards to a settlement agreement, a reduction in real property taxes or a payment in lieu of taxes of at least twenty percent in the aggregate over the term of such settlement agreement; and permits the establishment of tax certiorari stabilization reserve funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1129 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8235A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10496 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - referred to ways and means