NY S08243 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the forbearance of residential mortgage payments; requires New York regulated banking organizations to make applications for forbearance for residential mortgages available to qualified mortgagors during the period in which the NY on PAUSE order is in effect in the county wherein the qualified mortgagor is located and to grant such applications for a period of 180 days.
Title
Relates to the forbearance of residential mortgage payments; requires New York regulated banking organizations to make applications for forbearance for residential mortgages available to qualified mortgagors during the period in which the NY on PAUSE order is in effect in the county wherein the qualified mortgagor is located and to grant such applications for a period of 180 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.112 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.36 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted for a10351b |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.651 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8243C |
2020-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8243B |
2020-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8243A |
2020-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A10351 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.112