NY S08249 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.500
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts Nedrow Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts Nedrow Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.500
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.379
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10918
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to local governments
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8249A
2018-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1200
2018-04-23SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10918 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8249a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback