NY S08251 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places requirements on honoring warranties of fire vehicles and ambulances; establishes the new emergency vehicle lemon law bill of rights; regulates arbitration proceedings.
Title
Places requirements on honoring warranties of fire vehicles and ambulances; establishes the new emergency vehicle lemon law bill of rights; regulates arbitration proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.387 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.456 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10424 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1958 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10424 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8251