NY S08254 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.501
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Peconic Bay region septic system replacement loan program; defines terms; authorizes any town in the Peconic Bay region to establish a septic system replacement loan program using water quality improvement monies from the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Peconic Bay region septic system replacement loan program; defines terms; authorizes any town in the Peconic Bay region to establish a septic system replacement loan program using water quality improvement monies from the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.501
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.356
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10445a
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 8254A
2018-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to local governments
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1603
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-04-23SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10445 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8254a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08254&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08254&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08254
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08254&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08254A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8254#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8254#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8254#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08254&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback