NY S08255 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the cost sharing cap for insulin from one hundred dollars to thirty dollars.
Title
Lowers the cost sharing cap for insulin from one hundred dollars to thirty dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.990 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10821 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - referred to insurance